Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro da Pago, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jul 1406AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
19 Oct 1411AppointedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
15 Jan 1420AppointedAdministrator of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
14 Mar 1421ResignedAdministrator of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
30 Dec 1426DiedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Pietro da Pago
Archbishop Pietro da Pago O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of Split (Spalato)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 460, and Page 246
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Jun 2021

Quantcast