Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Thuruthikonam

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vijayapuram


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1929BornTiruvalla
12 Mar 195929.6Ordained PriestPriest of Vijayapuram, India
5 May 198858.8AppointedBishop of Vijayapuram, India
4 Aug 198859.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vijayapuram, India
8 May 200676.8RetiredBishop of Vijayapuram, India
5 Sep 201182.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Vijayapuram, India

MicroData Summary for Peter Thuruthikonam:
Bishop Peter Thuruthikonam (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vijayapuram

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 May 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,564
  • d: CB, 5 Sep 2011
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013