Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Zagreb

Archidioecesis Zagrebiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Josip Bozanić, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Mijo Gorski, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Ivan Šaško, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Valentin Pozaić, S.J., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 December 1852
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Croatia
  • Square Kilometers: 4,246 (1,640 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.zg-nadbiskupija.hr/
  • Mailing Address: Nadbiskupski Duhovni Stol, Kaptol 31, 10000 Zagreb, Hrvatska
  • Telephone: (01)48.94.808
  • Fax: 48.17.714

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Zagreb (Agram)
1093ErectedDiocese of Zagreb (Agram) (erected)
17 June 1777Territory LostDiocese of Veszprém
Diocese of Zagreb (Agram)
Diocese of Szombathely (erected)
Archdiocese of Zagreb
11 December 1852ElevatedDiocese of Zagreb (Agram) Archdiocese of Zagreb
5 July 1997Territory LostArchdiocese of Zagreb Diocese of Požega (erected)
Diocese of Varaždin (erected)
5 December 2009Territory LostArchdiocese of Zagreb Diocese of Bjelovar-Križevci (erected)
Diocese of Sisak (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Zagreb
19501,900,0002,353,00080.7%6122058172,3253591,298385ap1951
19701,900,0002,300,00082.6%4942617552,5165401,642414ap1971
19802,000,0002,350,00085.1%5972868832,2654351,572459ap1981
19901,819,5502,194,00082.9%5513038542,1305031,475489ap1991
19991,381,3361,670,43282.7%3822646462,1384211,503294ap2000
20001,381,9821,671,32482.7%3802816612,0901081,374296ap2001
20011,380,2981,670,24382.6%3722816532,1133981,337298ap2002
20021,365,9851,639,43283.3%3782896672,0473981,366307ap2003
20031,456,2141,645,12388.5%4132866992,0833841,305310ap2004
20041,455,9831,644,95688.5%3943287222,0164191,317312ap2005
20101,101,9001,237,65089.0%3042645681,93975181,067203ap2011
20141,081,5391,239,70887.2%3262445701,897153911,129206ap2015
20171,002,9231,211,29882.8%3312395701,759154121,036205ap2018

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Zagreb (Agram)
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 537, and Page 538
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 271
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 338
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 375
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 421
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 448
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 401
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 600
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.7, 8 May 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast