Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Schu, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yanzhou [Yenchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1892Born
191320.7ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
23 Sep 191624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
19 Nov 193644.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Yenchowfu, China
19 Nov 193644.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Trapezopolis
4 Apr 193745.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trapezopolis
11 Apr 194654.0AppointedBishop of Yanzhou [Yenchow], China
24 Aug 196573.3DiedBishop of Yanzhou [Yenchow], China

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Schu
Bishop Teodoro Schu S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Yanzhou [Yenchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTholey, Diocese of Trier, Germany
Ordained BishopYenchow
Death PlaceSt. Wendel, Germany

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,937, Number 17
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Jan 2020
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,109, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast