Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Luechai Thatwisai

Bishop of Udon Thani, Thailand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1962 Born
24 May 199027.4Ordained PriestPriest of Udon Thani, Thailand
14 Nov 200946.9AppointedBishop of Udon Thani, Thailand
6 Feb 201047.1Ordained BishopBishop of Udon Thani, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Joseph Luechai Thatwisai
Bishop Joseph Luechai Thatwisai (born ) Bishop of Udon Thani

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhonsung

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Udon Thani.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,568

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast