Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adalbert Schmücker, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tsinanfu, China

Titular Bishop of Elearchia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1878Born
15 Aug 189617.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
14 Aug 190526.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
19 Aug 192041.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale}, China
19 Aug 192041.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Elearchia
29 Jun 192142.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elearchia
8 Aug 192748.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Tsinanfu, China

MicroData Summary for Adalbert Schmücker
Bishop Adalbert Schmücker O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tsinanfu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlsberg, Diocese of Paderborn, Germany
Ordained BishopTsinafu, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale}
Death PlaceTsingtao

  • a priest for 21.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1921, Number 45
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast