Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Norberto Perini

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Fermo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1888Born
7 Jul 191224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
22 Oct 194153.3AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
30 Nov 194153.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
5 Jan 194253.5InstalledArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
21 Jun 197688.0RetiredArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
9 Dec 197789.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Norberto Perini
Archbishop Norberto Perini (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Fermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarpiano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopBusto Arsizio, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceRho, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Archiepiscopal Seminary, Chapel, Fermo, Archdiocese of Fermo
Buried Place (Current)Crypt, Cathedral, Fermo, Archdiocese of Fermo

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 62
  • loc: AM, 23 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 25 Mar 2019

Quantcast