Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Maria Dino Piccinelli, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ancona e Numana

Titular Bishop of Gaudiaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1905BornS. Benedetto Val di Sambro
5 Feb 192823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
23 Jun 196661.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
23 Jun 196661.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gaudiaba
10 Jul 196661.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gaudiaba
23 Nov 198378.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
1 Oct 198479.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ancona e Numana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Maria Dino Piccinelli:
Bishop Bernardino Maria Dino Piccinelli O.S.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ancona e Numana

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013