Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melchior Zhang Kexing (Chang K’o-hing)

Deceased

Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1914Born
18 Mar 193925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China
3 Nov 194935.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China
3 Nov 194935.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Clypia
24 May 195137.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Clypia
24 Nov 195137.8SucceededBishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China
6 Nov 198874.8DiedBishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China

MicroData Summary for Melchior Zhang Kexing (Chang K’o-hing)
Bishop Melchior Zhang Kexing (Chang K’o-hing) (born , died ) Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiwantze
Ordained BishopKalgan
Death PlaceSuanwha

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,951, Number 49
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 26 Jan 2020

Quantcast