Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Friedrich von Seinsheim

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

Bishop of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1708³Born
28 Mar 175042.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Sep 175345.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jan 175546.8SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
17 Mar 175547.0ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
15 Jun 175547.3Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
21 Apr 175749.1SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
23 May 175749.2ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
18 Feb 177971.0DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adam Friedrich von Seinsheim
Bishop Adam Friedrich von Seinsheim (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRegensburg

  • a priest for 25.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 114, and Page 234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018