Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Philipp Karl Anton von Fechenbach zu Laudenbach

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Taenarum

Titular See: (Grand Master/Order of St. George)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1708Born
6 May 173122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
31 Aug 176759.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Taenarum
1 Nov 176759.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taenarum
26 Dec 177971.5DiedTitular Bishop of Taenarum

MicroData Summary for Johann Philipp Karl Anton von Fechenbach zu Laudenbach
Bishop Johann Philipp Karl Anton von Fechenbach zu Laudenbach (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Taenarum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWürzburg

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 390

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018