Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Joseph von Nitschke

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

Titular Bishop of Antipatris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1708BornMainz
14 Jun 174031.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
16 Dec 174840.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
16 Dec 174840.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipatris
23 Mar 174940.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antipatris
23 May 177869.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Joseph von Nitschke:
Bishop Heinrich Joseph von Nitschke (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 88, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015