Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adalbert (Philipp Wilhelm) Walderdorf, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fulda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1697BornMolsberg
29 Sep 171720.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Dec 171922.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Oct 172023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
17 Jan 175759.3SelectedBishop of Fulda, Germany
28 Mar 175759.5ConfirmedBishop of Fulda, Germany
19 Jun 175759.8Ordained BishopBishop of Fulda, Germany
16 Sep 175962.0DiedBishop of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Adalbert (Philipp Wilhelm) Walderdorf:
Bishop Adalbert (Philipp Wilhelm) Walderdorf O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Fulda

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 220
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Nov 2015