Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Johann Anton von Gebsattel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Sigus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1718Born
23 Dec 174123.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Würzburg, Germany
21 Oct 174224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
6 May 174829.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany
6 May 174829.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sigus
2 Jun 174829.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sigus
12 Jul 178869.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Daniel Johann Anton von Gebsattel
Bishop Daniel Johann Anton von Gebsattel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFulda

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 380, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast