Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Bernhard Mayer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

Titular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1669³BornLauda
18 Sep 169424.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Würzburg, Germany
18 Dec 169425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
26 Jan 170535.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany
26 Jan 170535.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
1 Mar 170535.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
7 Sep 174777.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Bernhard Mayer:
Bishop Johann Bernhard Mayer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 158

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 17 Jun 2015