Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Philipp Franz von Schönborn

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1673³BornWürzburg
15 Dec 171946.8AppointedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
25 Jul 172047.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 172047.7Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
18 Aug 172451.5DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Philipp Franz von Schönborn:
Bishop Johann Philipp Franz von Schönborn (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

  • a priest for 4.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015