Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wolther Heinrich von Strevesdorff, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588²BornNeuss
1611²23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
1 Oct 163446.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
1 Oct 163446.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
7 Jan 163547.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
7 May 1674³86.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wolther Heinrich von Strevesdorff:
Bishop Wolther Heinrich von Strevesdorff O.S.A. (born 1588, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 96
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1635, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 May 2015