Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph Franz von Hutten

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1673³BornMainburg
29 Mar 171743.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Würzburg, Germany
31 Oct 171744.4Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
2 Oct 172451.3SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
20 Dec 172451.5ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
8 Apr 172551.8Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
25 Mar 172955.8DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christoph Franz von Hutten:
Bishop Christoph Franz von Hutten (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

  • a priest for 11.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 219

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015