Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Adam Behr

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

Titular Bishop of Hemeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1724³BornForchheim
14 Apr 174924.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
28 Sep 177854.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
28 Sep 177854.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria
28 Oct 177854.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria
5 Nov 180581.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Adam Behr
Bishop Johann Adam Behr (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 236, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016