Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich Karl von Schönborn

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg

Apostolic Administrator of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1674BornMainz
13 Dec 170834.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
19 May 171036.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
19 May 171036.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
10 Jun 172854.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
20 Jun 172854.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
30 Jan 172954.9SucceededBishop of Bamberg, Germany
18 May 172955.2SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
3 Aug 172955.4ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
3 Aug 172955.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bamberg, Germany
26 Jul 174672.3DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Karl von Schönborn:
Bishop Friedrich Karl von Schönborn (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

  • a priest for 18.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015