Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Caspar Adolph Schernauer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Aradus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1668Born
169122.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
10 May 172859.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
10 May 172859.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aradus
11 Jun 172859.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aradus
20 Jun 173364.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Caspar Adolph Schernauer
Bishop Caspar Adolph Schernauer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMainz

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 94
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast