Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Anton Wallreuther

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Worms

Titular Bishop of Sarepta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1673BornKiedrich
22 Feb 169824.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
15 Mar 169824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
5 Mar 173157.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Worms, Germany
5 Mar 173157.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
22 Apr 173157.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
16 Jan 173460.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Worms, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Anton Wallreuther:
Bishop Johann Anton Wallreuther (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Worms

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 367, and Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1731, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015