Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philipp Karl von Eltz zu Kempenich

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1665Born
29 Aug 169933.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
3 Jun 173266.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
9 Jun 173266.6SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
3 Sep 173266.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
16 Nov 173267.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
21 Mar 174377.4DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Philipp Karl von Eltz zu Kempenich
Archbishop Philipp Karl von Eltz zu Kempenich (born , died ) Archbishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEltz

  • a priest for 10.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 37
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 292

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018