Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Joseph Anton von Hahn

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

Titular Bishop of Arad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1699BornWürzburg
5 Jun 172828.8Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
27 Mar 173434.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
27 Mar 173434.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Arad
19 Sep 173435.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arad
4 Jul 174848.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Joseph Anton von Hahn:
Bishop Franz Joseph Anton von Hahn (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

  • a priest for 20.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 94, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015