Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antal Kázmér von Thurn und Valsassina

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1680BornBleiburg
22 Dec 170323.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 172847.8SelectedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
23 Dec 172949.4ConfirmedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
23 Apr 173049.7Ordained BishopBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
9 Oct 173252.2SelectedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
2 Mar 173352.6ConfirmedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
25 Dec 173454.4DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Antal Kázmér von Thurn und Valsassina:
Bishop Antal Kázmér von Thurn und Valsassina (born , died ) Bishop of Pécs

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 117
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013