Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andreas Joseph Fahrmann

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

Titular Bishop of Halmiros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1742BornZell
22 Dec 176422.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Würzburg, Germany
21 Dec 176523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
29 Mar 179047.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany
29 Mar 179047.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Halmiros
16 May 179047.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Halmiros
6 Feb 180259.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Andreas Joseph Fahrmann:
Bishop Andreas Joseph Fahrmann (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 78, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013