Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Karl Ignaz von Fechenbach zu Laudenbach

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg

Bishop of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1749³BornMainz
6 Feb 177929.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
18 Feb 177929.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
12 Mar 179546.0SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
1 Jun 179546.2ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
21 Jun 179546.3Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
11 Aug 180051.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
28 Sep 180556.6SucceededBishop of Bamberg, Germany
9 Apr 180859.1DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georg Karl Ignaz von Fechenbach zu Laudenbach
Bishop Georg Karl Ignaz von Fechenbach zu Laudenbach (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 104
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016