Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Alexandre d’Arberg et de Valengin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ypres (Ieper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1734BornNivelle
22 Mar 176025.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
19 Dec 176127.3Ordained PriestPriest of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
31 Aug 176733.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium
31 Aug 176733.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyzon
25 Oct 176733.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyzon
4 May 178550.7SelectedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
19 Dec 178551.3ConfirmedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
9 Apr 178651.6InstalledBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
8 Dec 180167.2ResignedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
10 May 180974.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium

MicroData Summary for Charles Alexandre d’Arberg et de Valengin
Bishop Charles Alexandre d’Arberg et de Valengin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ypres (Ieper)

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 81, and Page 447
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 452
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016