Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Louis Jacquet

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1688³Born
27 Jan 173748.0Ordained PriestPriest of Liège, Belgium
11 Feb 173748.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium
11 Feb 173748.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
17 Feb 173748.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
10 Oct 176374.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Louis Jacquet
Bishop Pierre Louis Jacquet (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Liège

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRochefort

  • a priest for 26.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 237, and Page 452
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1737, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018