Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Nicolas Alexandre d’Oultremont

Deceased

Bishop of Liège


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1716³BornWarfusée
8 Aug 174125.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Apr 176346.8SelectedBishop of Liège, Belgium
4 May 176447.8ConfirmedBishop of Liège, Belgium
10 Jun 176447.9Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
22 Oct 177155.3DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Nicolas Alexandre d’Oultremont:
Bishop Charles Nicolas Alexandre d’Oultremont (born , died ) Bishop of Liège

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 11 Dec 2015