Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Karl von Velbrück

Deceased

Bishop of Liège


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1719³BornDusseldorf, Germany
16 Jan 177252.5SelectedBishop of Liège, Belgium
30 Mar 177252.7ConfirmedBishop of Liège, Belgium
26 Apr 177252.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 177252.8Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
30 Apr 178464.7DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Karl von Velbrück:
Bishop Franz Karl von Velbrück (born , died ) Bishop of Liège

  • a priest for 12.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 16 Dec 2015