Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwig Philipp Behelm

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

Titular Bishop of Domitiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1714BornDuderstadt
26 May 173622.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
10 Sep 173723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
11 Sep 176955.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
11 Sep 176955.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis
17 Dec 176955.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis
22 Jun 177763.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ludwig Philipp Behelm:
Bishop Ludwig Philipp Behelm (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 199, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015