Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Karl Theodor von Dalberg

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1744³BornMannheim
5 Jun 178743.3SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mainz, Germany
19 Jun 178743.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Worms, Germany
3 Feb 178843.9Ordained PriestPriest of Worms, Germany
10 Mar 178844.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Worms, Germany
10 Mar 178844.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
10 Mar 178844.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mainz, Germany
18 Jun 178844.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
31 Aug 178844.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
15 Sep 178844.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
17 Jan 180055.9SucceededBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
29 Nov 180157.8ResignedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mainz, Germany
1802²57.8ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Worms, Germany
1 Feb 180560.9AppointedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
10 Feb 181773.0DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Karl Theodor von Dalberg
Archbishop Karl Theodor von Dalberg (born , died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 318
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 180, and Page 293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 394, and Page 447

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016