Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephan Alexander Würdtwein

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Worms

Titular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1722³BornAmorbach
18 Sep 174522.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
18 Dec 174523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
18 Jul 178360.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Worms, Germany
18 Jul 178360.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica
31 Aug 178360.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica
11 Apr 179673.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Worms, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stephan Alexander Würdtwein
Bishop Stephan Alexander Würdtwein (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Worms

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 233, and Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016