Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Georg Joseph von Eckart

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

Titular Bishop of Ioppe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1723BornMainz
26 Mar 174623.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
4 Jun 174623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
11 Sep 176946.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
11 Sep 176946.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioppe
17 Dec 176946.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ioppe
17 Jun 179269.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Georg Joseph von Eckart:
Bishop Johann Georg Joseph von Eckart (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 245, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016