Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adalbert (Wilhelm Adolph Heinrich) von Harstall, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fulda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1737BornTreffurt
1759¹21.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Sep 176023.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Sep 176124.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Nov 178851.6SelectedBishop of Fulda, Germany
30 Mar 178952.0ConfirmedBishop of Fulda, Germany
24 May 178952.1Ordained BishopBishop of Fulda, Germany
8 Oct 181477.5DiedBishop of Fulda, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adalbert (Wilhelm Adolph Heinrich) von Harstall
Bishop Adalbert (Wilhelm Adolph Heinrich) von Harstall O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Fulda

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016