Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Hieronymus Karl von Kolborn

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

Titular Bishop of Capharnaum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1744BornNiederwalluf
24 May 176622.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
14 Mar 176723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
17 Nov 180662.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
17 Nov 180662.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
11 Jan 180762.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
20 May 181672.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Hieronymus Karl von Kolborn:
Bishop Joseph Hieronymus Karl von Kolborn (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013