Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Franz Christoph Cardinal von Hutten zu Stolzenfels

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1706BornWiesenfeld
1743²36.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Nov 174337.6SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
1 Jan 174437.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 174437.9ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
17 May 174438.1Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
23 Nov 176155.7Elevated to Cardinal
20 Apr 177064.1DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Christoph von Hutten zu Stolzenfels:
Franz Christoph Cardinal von Hutten zu Stolzenfels (born , died ) Bishop of Speyer

  • a priest for 26.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
  • a cardinal for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: CB, 14 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 17
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Nov 1761

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Nov 2015