Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Adam Buckel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer

Titular Bishop of Corada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1706BornHeidingsfeld
13 Mar 172822.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Würzburg, Germany
25 Mar 173024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
9 Mar 174539.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany
9 Mar 174539.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Corada
24 Apr 174640.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corada
19 Oct 177165.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Johann Adam Buckel:
Bishop Johann Adam Buckel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 147, and Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015