Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Damian August Philipp Karl von Limburg-Styrum

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1721BornGemen
25 Jul 174524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
29 May 177049.2SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
6 Aug 177049.4ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
16 Sep 177049.5Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
26 Feb 179775.9DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Damian August Philipp Karl von Limburg-Styrum:
Bishop Damian August Philipp Karl von Limburg-Styrum (born , died ) Bishop of Speyer

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013