Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich Wilhelm von Westphalen

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim

Vicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions

Bishop of Paderborn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1727BornPaderborn
7 Feb 176335.8SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
27 Mar 176336.0Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
16 May 176336.1ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
23 Oct 176336.5Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
1 Mar 177345.9SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
14 Jun 177346.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
177547.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany
26 Dec 178255.7SucceededBishop of Paderborn, Germany
6 Jan 178961.8DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Wilhelm von Westphalen:
Bishop Friedrich Wilhelm von Westphalen (born , died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 25.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013