Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Anton Xaver von Scheben

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Worms

Titular Bishop of Assuras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1711³BornNiederburg
29 May 173423.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
11 Jun 173423.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
22 Apr 176554.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Worms, Germany
22 Apr 176554.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Assuras
26 May 176554.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assuras
19 Nov 177968.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Worms, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Anton Xaver von Scheben:
Bishop Franz Anton Xaver von Scheben (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Worms

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015