Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Philipp von Walderdorff

Deceased

Archbishop of Trier

Bishop of Worms


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1701BornMolsberg
29 Jan 173634.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trier, Germany
7 Oct 174241.3Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
11 Jul 175453.1SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Trier, Germany
16 Sep 175453.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Trier, Germany
16 Sep 175453.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
15 Jun 175554.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
18 Jan 175654.6SucceededArchbishop of Trier, Germany
20 Jul 176362.1SelectedBishop of Worms, Germany
26 Sep 176362.3ConfirmedBishop of Worms, Germany
12 Jan 176866.6DiedArchbishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Philipp von Walderdorff:
Archbishop Johann Philipp von Walderdorff (born , died ) Archbishop of Trier

  • a priest for 25.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 331, and Page 414
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 447

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Nov 2015