Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Damien de Hoensbroeck

Deceased

Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1724Born
28 Oct 177147.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Roermond, Netherlands
1 Nov 177147.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roermond, Netherlands
24 Apr 177450.1SelectedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
29 May 177551.2ConfirmedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
2 Jul 177551.3Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
30 Oct 177551.6InstalledBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
17 Apr 179369.1DiedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Philippe Damien de Hoensbroeck
Bishop Philippe Damien de Hoensbroeck (born , died ) Bishop of Roermond

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoermond

  • a priest for 21.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1791
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 361
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1775, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018