Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentin Philipp Anton Schmidt

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany

Titular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1734Born
21 Sep 175117.3ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
10 Sep 176228.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
18 Sep 176228.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Aug 176733.2Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
177540.5IncardinatedPriest of Speyer, Germany
29 Mar 179055.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany
29 Mar 179055.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
16 May 179055.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
13 Sep 180571.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Valentin Philipp Anton Schmidt
Bishop Valentin Philipp Anton Schmidt (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArnstein

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 402, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018