Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Konrad von Stadion und Thannhausen

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1679BornArnstein
2 Feb 172444.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 175373.9SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
26 Sep 175374.1ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
4 Nov 175374.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
6 Mar 175777.5DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Konrad von Stadion und Thannhausen:
Bishop Franz Konrad von Stadion und Thannhausen (born , died ) Bishop of Bamberg

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013