Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Praphon Chaicharoen, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Surat Thani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1930BornHua Phai
24 Feb 194918.8ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
11 Feb 196029.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 Jun 198858.1AppointedBishop of Surat Thani, Thailand
24 Sep 198858.4Ordained BishopBishop of Surat Thani, Thailand
20 May 200373.0DiedBishop of Surat Thani, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Michael Praphon Chaicharoen:
Bishop Michael Praphon Chaicharoen S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Surat Thani

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013