Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Diocese of Tyniec | |||
20 September 1821 | Erected | Diocese of Kraków | Diocese of Tyniec (erected) |
Diocese of Tarnów | |||
23 April 1826 | Name Changed | Diocese of Tyniec | Diocese of Tarnów |
28 November 1936 | Territory Added | Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow} (Ispina and Krzykowka) | Diocese of Tarnów |
25 March 1992 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Lublin (Janów Lubelski and Zaklików)
Diocese of Przemyśl (Gorzyce Tarnobrzeskie, Nisko, Raniżów, Rudnik nad Sanem, Stalowa Wola, Tarnobrzeg Południe, and Tarnobrzeg Północ) Diocese of Sandomierz-Radom (Koprzywnica, Łagów, Opatów, Ostrowiec Świętokrzyski-Wschód, Ostrowiec Świętokrzyski-Zachód, Sandomierz, Staszów, and Zawichost) Diocese of Tarnów (Baranów) | Diocese of Sandomierz |
25 March 1992 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Przemyśl (Brzostek, Czudek, Frysztak, Głogów, Jasło Wschód, Jasło Zachód, Rzeszów I, Rzeszów II, Rzeszów III, Rzeszów IV, Sokołów, Strzyźów, Tyczyn, and Żmigród)
Diocese of Tarnów (Kolbuszowa, and parts of Ropczyce, Sędziszów, Biecz, Gorlice Półnóc, and Gorlice Południe) | Diocese of Rzeszów (erected) |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diocese of Tarnów | ||||||||||||
1950 | 979,795 | 982,000 | 99.8% | 614 | 70 | 684 | 1,432 | 70 | 1,156 | 310 | ap1951 | |
1970 | 1,122,000 | 1,132,000 | 99.1% | 855 | 135 | 990 | 1,133 | 167 | 1,352 | 356 | ap1971 | |
1980 | 1,178,000 | 1,185,000 | 99.4% | 966 | 148 | 1,114 | 1,057 | 264 | 1,350 | 402 | ap1981 | |
1990 | 1,305,000 | 1,315,000 | 99.2% | 1,133 | 156 | 1,289 | 1,012 | 294 | 1,372 | 477 | ap1991 | |
1999 | 1,116,240 | 1,119,740 | 99.7% | 1,129 | 131 | 1,260 | 885 | 228 | 1,158 | 437 | ap2000 | |
2000 | 1,116,600 | 1,119,600 | 99.7% | 1,112 | 125 | 1,237 | 902 | 196 | 1,133 | 438 | ap2001 | |
2001 | 1,121,200 | 1,124,700 | 99.7% | 1,142 | 135 | 1,277 | 877 | 199 | 1,155 | 438 | ap2002 | |
2002 | 1,121,252 | 1,126,920 | 99.5% | 1,153 | 148 | 1,301 | 861 | 213 | 1,115 | 436 | ap2003 | |
2003 | 1,124,125 | 1,139,951 | 98.6% | 1,176 | 142 | 1,318 | 852 | 191 | 1,106 | 442 | ap2004 | |
2004 | 1,128,115 | 1,134,319 | 99.5% | 1,184 | 150 | 1,334 | 845 | 227 | 1,105 | 442 | ap2005 | |
2010 | 1,115,647 | 1,122,583 | 99.4% | 1,266 | 149 | 1,415 | 788 | 203 | 1,080 | 447 | ap2011 | |
2014 | 1,091,829 | 1,097,279 | 99.5% | 1,307 | 148 | 1,455 | 750 | 175 | 970 | 450 | ap2015 | |
2017 | 1,111,156 | 1,115,900 | 99.6% | 1,289 | 149 | 1,438 | 772 | 194 | 950 | 452 | ap2018 | |
2020 | 1,099,345 | 1,130,130 | 97.3% | 1,342 | 139 | 1,481 | 742 | 184 | 952 | 454 | ap2021 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 11 Oct 2023 |
✠