Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Przemyśl

Archidioecesis Premisliensis Latinorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Adam Szal, Archbishop
  • Krzysztof Chudzio, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Stanisław Jamrozek, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Józef Michalik, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 25 March 1992
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Poland
  • Square Kilometers: 9,750 (3,765 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://przemyska.pl/
  • Mailing Address: Kuria Metropolitalna, Pl. Katedralny 4/A, 37-700 Przemysl, Polska
  • Telephone: (016)678.66.94

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Przemyśl
13 April 1375ErectedDiocese of Przemyśl (erected)
29 April 1922Territory AddedArchdiocese of Lviv (Uryez) Diocese of Przemyśl
7 August 1931Territory LostDiocese of Przemyśl (Henrykówka) Archdiocese of Lviv
25 March 1992Territory LostDiocese of Lublin (Janów Lubelski and Zaklików)
Diocese of Przemyśl (Gorzyce Tarnobrzeskie, Nisko, Raniżów, Rudnik nad Sanem, Stalowa Wola, Tarnobrzeg Południe, and Tarnobrzeg Północ)
Diocese of Sandomierz-Radom (Koprzywnica, Łagów, Opatów, Ostrowiec Świętokrzyski-Wschód, Ostrowiec Świętokrzyski-Zachód, Sandomierz, Staszów, and Zawichost)
Diocese of Tarnów (Baranów)
Diocese of Sandomierz
25 March 1992Territory LostDiocese of Przemyśl (Brzostek, Czudek, Frysztak, Głogów, Jasło Wschód, Jasło Zachód, Rzeszów I, Rzeszów II, Rzeszów III, Rzeszów IV, Sokołów, Strzyźów, Tyczyn, and Żmigród)
Diocese of Tarnów (Kolbuszowa, and parts of Ropczyce, Sędziszów, Biecz, Gorlice Półnóc, and Gorlice Południe)
Diocese of Rzeszów (erected)
Archdiocese of Przemyśl
25 March 1992ElevatedDiocese of Przemyśl Archdiocese of Przemyśl

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Przemyśl
19501,200,0002,000,00060.0%6421227641,5703061,180449ap1951
19701,360,000.0%80011591501151,310420ap1971*
19801,485,5531,524,02997.5%8721109821,5121281,250487ap1981
19901,636,7081,646,40799.4%1,1261701,2961,2622111,472589ap1991
Archdiocese of Przemyśl
1999817,976820,00099.8%7931749678452201,161377ap2000
2000818,947822,00099.6%7771769538592441,170381ap2001
2001817,266820,00099.7%7801789588532511,188384ap2002
2002812,667815,00099.7%7831789618452481,190384ap2003
2003813,841820,00099.2%8021789808302471,195384ap2004
2004763,352780,00097.9%8071769837762381,122383ap2005
2013756,006784,45496.4%8741691,0437242151,097388ap2014
2016745,512795,96993.7%8791701,0497102061,057390ap2017
2019735,000814,00090.3%8941631,057695187906391ap2020
2021726,760822,43088.4%8461991,045695237840391ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Przemyśl
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 409
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 219
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 279, and Page 280
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 288
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 323, and Page 324
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 348
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 314
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 469
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 356, to Page 357
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 14, Page 349, and Page 350
  • Archdiocese of Przemyśl
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 84, Page 1,099, to Page 1,112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.8, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 15 Jul 2024