Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Hong Văn Tiem, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bi Chu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1938BornHai Son
19 Apr 197334.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
4 Jul 200162.8AppointedBishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam
8 Aug 200162.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam
17 Aug 201374.9DiedBishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Hong Văn Tiem:
Bishop Joseph Hong Văn Tiem S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Bi Chu

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 17 Aug 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013